Rys, Trisha Marie (CPSO#: 98482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 10
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2M 3M6
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Trisha Rys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rys ( CPSO# 98482 )

Business Address:
Teck Pioneer Residence
145 Government Road West
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 2E8
Phone Number: (705) 567-3257

Business Address:
Box 10
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (705) 567-2224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISHA MARIE RYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014