First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 May 2019 |