Millward, Steven Frank (CPSO#: 54715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. R. Elyas ( CPSO# 90679 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140


Corporation Name: Steven Millward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN FRANK MILLWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLWARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985