Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jan 2021
Summary:
On February 7, 2020, allegations of Dr. Upadhye’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Upadhye engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
The matter was heard on January 15, 2021 by way of videoconference in the presence of counsel for the College, Dr. Upadhye, and counsel for Dr. Upadhye. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), the Committee found that Dr. Upadhye committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of patients.
Disposition
On January 18, 2021, the Discipline Committee issued its Order directing that:
• Dr. Upadhye attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Upadhye’s certificate of registration for four months commencing Feb. 1, 2021
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Upadhye’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order
• Dr. Upadhye pay costs to the College in the amount of $6000.00
The Committee’s full reasons for decision were released on April 9, 2021 and are available for review on the College’s website.