Wu, Sing Man (CPSO#: 29261)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.M. Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wu ( CPSO# 29261 )

Business Address:
203 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M4V 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 449-7121

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 27, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sing Man Wu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 27, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Wu’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

- Dr. Wu will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College effective immediately, and for the period up to and including December 31, 2017.