Saad, Wassim (CPSO#: 76259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Internal Medicine Associates
Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 252-9861 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 252-7977
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Saad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saad ( CPSO# 76252 )
Dr. W. Saad ( CPSO# 76259 )

Business Address:
202 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 252-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WASSIM SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005