Saar, John Ernest (CPSO#: 60704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1419 Carling Ave.
Suite 216
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L6
Phone: (613) 722-6216
Fax: (613) 722-2177
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Saar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Saar ( CPSO# 60704 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-6216

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ERNEST SAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1990