Saary, Maria Joan (CPSO#: 71369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Occupational Health
4th Floor Shuter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5074
Fax: (416) 864-5421
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CFEME Toronto
1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3K 2C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 635-2110
Fax: (416) 635-2102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joan Saary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saary ( CPSO# 71369 )

Business Address:
Health Centre
Main Office Building
602 South Christina Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 7M5
Phone Number: (519) 339-2253

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5074

Business Address:
1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3M 3B9
Phone Number: (416) 635-2110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA JOAN SAARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004