Sabatino, Assunta Cindy (CPSO#: 61236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1305 Richmond Road
Suite 201
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Y4
Phone: (613) 829-3221
Fax: (613) 829-6832
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASSUNTA CINDY SABATINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABATINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991