Sabesan, Priyadharshini (CPSO#: 110560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital , Room No A2 561
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76875
Fax: 519 667 6836
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priyadharshini Sabesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sabesan ( CPSO# 110560)

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room A2-561
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 694-7704

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Priyadharshini Sabesan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Psychiatry, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Sabesan
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sabesan  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sabesan's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sabesan's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 19, 2016, and expires on June 30,
                  2018.  Upon renewal of Dr. Sabesan's academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.