Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sabetti, Linda Marian (CPSO#: 60970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Suite 420
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone: (905) 625-1619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda M. Sabetti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sabetti ( CPSO# 60970 )

Business Address:
Suite 420
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 625-1619

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA MARIAN SABETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABETTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990