Sabga, Edward Anthony (CPSO#: 21886)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2009

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 28, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Edward Anthony Sabga to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Edward A. Sabga:

2). Hereby resign from the College, effective September 1, 2009.
3). Undertake not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
4). Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as public information.
5). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated June 29, 2009 (the “Notice”) for failure to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and incompetence in my care and treatment of Patient “A”.
6). By entering into this undertaking, do not admit any of the allegations contained in the Notice.
7). Agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice.