Sabin, Norman (CPSO#: 61498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jewish General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3755 Cote Ste Catherine
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8222 Ext. 8253

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN SABIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1989