Sabir, Sonia (CPSO#: 66476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KMH Cardiology and Diagnostic
Suite 101
50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7X8
Canada
Phone: (905) 731-7232
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Sabir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sabir ( CPSO# 66476 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-2111

Business Address:
101 - 50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7X8
Phone Number: (905) 731-7232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA SABIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995