Sabloff, Mitchell (CPSO#: 69041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Haematology
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71284
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabloff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sabloff ( CPSO# 69041 )

Business Address:
Division of Haematology
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITCHELL SABLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABLOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2000 to 07 Nov 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001