Sabouba, Mohammad Fayez (CPSO#: 70814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
609 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y9
Phone: (905) 575-7230
Fax: (905) 575-7191
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1100 Dundas Street West, Unit #4
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E7
Canada
Phone: (905) 232-3746
Fax: (905)575-7191
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabouba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sabouba ( CPSO# 70814 )

Business Address:
609 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y9
Phone Number: (905) 575-7230

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD FAYEZ SABOUBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABOUBA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 12 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998