Sabourin, Kenneth Bernard (CPSO#: 63604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Sport Medicine Centre
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 727-2745
Fax: (613) 727-2623
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital
Dept of Surgery
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8081
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2675 Concession Rd
Dept. of Surgery
Kemptville Hospital
Surgical Assistant
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

CBI Health Centre
Kanata ON  K2V 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 599-0299
Fax: (613) 599-0298
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH BERNARD SABOURIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABOURIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992