Sabra, Sally Moustafa Mohamed Hassan (CPSO#: 88021)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 24 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012