Sabri, Kourosh (CPSO#: 83309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Bristol, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
3V2 Paediatric Ophthalmology Clinic
Department of Surgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73509
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kourosh Sabri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sabri ( CPSO# 83309 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Paediatric Ophthalmology Clinic
Department of Surgery Room 3V2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOUROSH SABRI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SABRI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SABRI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SABRI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SABRI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SABRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017