Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sachdeva, Jasdip Singh (CPSO#: 66594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 453-0715
Fax: (905) 453-0972
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JS Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sachdeva ( CPSO# 66594 )
Dr. A. Filomeno De Figueiredo ( CPSO# 68006 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 453-0715

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASDIP SINGH SACHDEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHDEVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1997