Sachdeva, Preeti (CPSO#: 70193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 718
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 971-7730
Fax: (416) 408-2802
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Preeti Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sachdeva ( CPSO# 70193 )

Business Address:
Suite 718
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 971-7730

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREETI SACHDEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHDEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998