Sacher, Adrian Gerold (CPSO#: 90868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Columbia University
New York-Presbyterian Hospital
177 Fort Washington Avenue
New York NY  10032
United States
Phone: (646) 317-6346

Medical Records Location

Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre, 610 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN GEROLD SACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2017