Sack, Jason Ellard (CPSO#: 71151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arnprior And District
Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-7720
Fax: (613) 623-3354
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 17 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ELLARD SACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007