Sacks, Diane Paula Gainen (CPSO#: 23746)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pittsburgh, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 1-800-775-0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Dec 2013


Address: Records Management 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 toll free: 1.800.775.0093 fax 1.888.316.4125 info@recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Contact Records Management
Date Received: 20 Sep 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015