Sadek-Botros, Gamal Edward (CPSO#: 55279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
231 Wharncliffe Rd S
London ON  N6J 2L3
Phone: (519) 963-0620
Fax: (519) 963-0621
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moussa Sadek-Botros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sadek-Botros ( CPSO# 55279 )
Dr. M. Moussa ( CPSO# 58087 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room A3-152
P.O. Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 963-0620

Medical Records Location

Address: 231 Wharncliffe Road South London ON N6J 2L3
Date Received: 18 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAMAL EDWARD SADEK-BOTROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEK-BOTROS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990