Sadikali, Fakhruddin (CPSO#: 26973)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of London, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Fakhruddin Sadikali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 16, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Sadikali’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Sadikali has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.