Sadikov, Evgeny Avenirovich (CPSO#: 78984)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: Sadikov, Evgeny Avernirovich (used until: 31 Jul 2003 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Moscow State University of Medicine & De, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 May 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004