Sadiq, Shehla (CPSO#: 83543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 2848131 Ext. 3118
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Sadiq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sadiq ( CPSO# 83543 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
4th Floor
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEHLA SADIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADIQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2005 to 07 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2007