Sadouski, Maria (CPSO#: 60681)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2000


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2000