Sadreddini, Masoud (CPSO#: 96929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2017

Expiry Date:  22 Feb 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Groningen, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone: 8073453355
Fax: 8073450099
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Sadreddini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sadreddini ( CPSO# 96929 )

Business Address:
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone Number: (807) 345-3355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 02 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 12 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 13 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Feb 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Masoud Sadreddini may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in cardiology and in a setting that is approved by the Chair,
                        Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences,
                        Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. Sadreddini holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sadreddini  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sadreddini's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sadreddini's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 2, 2017, and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of February 22, 2022.  The expiry date of this certificate
                  may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.