Saeed Kamil, Zaid Kamal (CPSO#: 91326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. Z. Saeed Kamil ( CPSO# 91326 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. M. Bonin ( CPSO# 58383 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-3181


Corporation Name: Dr. Zaid Kamal Saeed Kamil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Saeed Kamil ( CPSO# 91326 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAID KAMAL SAEED KAMIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED KAMIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2014