Saeed, Maheen (CPSO#: 96962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
100 Marie Curie Suite 300
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Maheen  Saeed  may  practise  medicine independently in internal medicine,
            infectious diseases and paediatrics, only.