Saeed, Niloufer (CPSO#: 42637)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Weber Medical Centre, Unit 5A, 1400 Weber Street East, Kitchener, ON, N2A 3Z8
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 01 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016