Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Safadi, James Scott (CPSO#: 70672)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 22 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 1999 to 15 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2000