Safakish, Ramin (CPSO#: 80554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Allevio Pain Management Clinic
Main Floor Suite 101
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: 6474788462
Fax: (647) 427-4100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Safakish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Safakish ( CPSO# 80554 )

Business Address:
Allevio Pain Management Clinic
Main Floor, Suite 101
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 840-5990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Mar 2004 to 02 Jun 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 03 Jun 2004 to 14 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 15 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 24, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ramin Safakish, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Safakish to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. RAMIN SAFAKISH
                                          ("Dr. Safakish")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Safakish, certificate of registration number 80554, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of three
                  College investigations bearing file numbers 7214038, 88956 and 91956 (the
                  "Investigations") into allegations that I do not meet the standard of
                  care in my practice and that I lack knowledge, skill and judgment.

            (3)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of
                  this Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to dispose of
                  the Investigations by issuing a verbal caution.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        cease performing epidural adhesiolysis.
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor, who is acceptable to the College (the
                        "Supervisor"), for at least nine (9) months.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that I have reviewed the
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Supervisor(s), including, at
                        minimum, the following:
                  
                        (i)   During the initial period of supervision, the Supervisor will
                              review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts every
                              fourteen (14) days, which shall be selected by the
                              Supervisor(s), and will meet with me at least once every
                              fourteen (14) days to discuss any concerns arising from the
                              chart reviews.  If, after three (3) months, the Supervisor(s)
                              determine that the patient care provided is satisfactory, and
                              the College approves, the supervision will step down to
                              monthly chart reviews and meetings for the following six (6)
                              months;
                  
                        (ii)  The Supervisor(s) will facilitate the education program set
                              out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (iii) The Supervisor(s) will make recommendations to me for
                              practice improvements;
                  
                        (iv)  The Supervisor(s) will submit written reports to the College
                              at least once every month, or more frequently if the
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice; and
                  
                        (v)   The Supervisor(s) will make recommendations to me for ongoing
                              professional development.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in all of the reports
                        provided to the College by the three medical inspectors, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to co-operate fully with the supervision
                        of my practice, conducted under this term of the Undertaking and
                        Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my
                        Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any recommended
                        practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within twenty
                        (20) days of the date I sign this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Safakish, agree that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Supervisor(s) on the terms set out under subparagraphs B(6)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Supervisor(s) acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Safakish, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of subparagraph B(6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said
                        term, condition and limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to, under the guidance of my
                        Supervisor(s), participate in and successfully complete the
                        following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in subparagraph B(7)(a).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out above
                        in subparagraph B(7)(a) as soon as possible.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in B(6) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment conducted under this term of the Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge and agree that my Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Safakish, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Safakish, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Safakish, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            C.          ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Safakish, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Safakish has been the subject of College investigations into
                        allegations that he fell below the standard of care in his pain
                        management practice. As a result of the investigations, Dr.
                        Safakish has voluntarily agreed to the following:
                  
                        *     Dr. Safakish will cease performing epidural adhesiolysis.
                        *     Dr. Safakish will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for nine (9) months. 
                        *     Dr. Safakish will engage in professional education pertaining
                              to his documentation and interventional pain practice.
                        *     Dr. Safakish's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of
                              the period of clinical supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Safakish, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education
                  set out in paragraph B(7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Safakish, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practise or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Safakish, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the professional education set out in
                  paragraph B(7) above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chief(s) of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Supervisor's undertaking set out at
                        Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at paragraph B(7) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 24, 2015
Expiry Date: October 1, 2015
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ramin Safakish to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 24, 2015:

Dr. Safakish has been the subject of College investigations into allegations that he fell below the standard of care in his pain management practice. As a result of the investigations, Dr. Safakish has voluntarily agreed to the following:

Dr. Safakish will cease performing epidural adhesiolysis.

Dr. Safakish will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for nine (9) months.

Dr. Safakish will engage in professional education pertaining to his documentation and interventional pain practice.

Dr. Safakish’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of clinical supervision.