Safavi, Nasrin (CPSO#: 98228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Isfahan University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Mcl 8-401
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166035977
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASRIN SAFAVI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SAFAVI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SAFAVI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAFAVI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SAFAVI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SAFAVI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SAFAVI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2012 to 11 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 26 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018