Saffer, Linda Susan (CPSO#: 31590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: Cohen, Linda Susan (used until: 27 Apr 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Promenade
1 Promenade Circle
Suite 302
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone: (905) 762-0526
Fax: (905) 762-0527
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saffer ( CPSO# 31590 )
Dr. M. Saffer ( CPSO# 28170 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 762-0525

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA SUSAN SAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999