Saffer, Mark David (CPSO#: 28170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Promenade
1 Promenade Circle
Suite 302
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone: (905) 762-0525
Fax: (905) 762-0527
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saffer ( CPSO# 31590 )
Dr. M. Saffer ( CPSO# 28170 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 762-0525

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID SAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2001