Saffie, Medina Gehaan (CPSO#: 97839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  20 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: Sarkar, Medina Gehaan (used until: 25 Jun 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEDINA GEHAAN SAFFIE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SAFFIE is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SAFFIE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAFFIE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SAFFIE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SAFFIE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SAFFIE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 20 Feb 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Feb 2018