Safranyos, Richard Gregory Alexander (CPSO#: 62619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 682-9335
Fax: (905) 682-3516
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Safranyos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Safranyos ( CPSO# 62619 )

Business Address:
205 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 682-9335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD GREGORY ALEXANDER SAFRANYOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFRANYOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992