Sager, Mohamed Galy Mohamed (CPSO#: 80220)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 18 Sep 2003 to 09 Dec 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 10 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004