Sagi, Henry Claude (CPSO#: 68437)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2000