Sagle, Margaret Allison (CPSO#: 51552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Fertility and Women's
Endocrine Clinic
250-3 Community Services Centre
10240 Kingsway Avenue
Edmonton AB  T5H 3V9
Phone: (780) 735-5609
Fax: (780) 735-5671

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ALLISON SAGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1988