Sagman, Doron (CPSO#: 58480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry - H5
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6211
Fax: (416) 482-6726
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DORON SAGMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAGMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988