Saha, Sudip Kumar (CPSO#: 99650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pune, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Seniors Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sudip Saha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saha ( CPSO# 99650 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6586

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDIP KUMAR SAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016