Saha, Tarit Kanti (CPSO#: 78692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7827
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: S. Yankova & T. Saha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. S. Yankova ( CPSO# 78846 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Psychiatry
Burr 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Providence Care
300-303 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7K 5W7
Phone Number: (613) 548-5567

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARIT KANTI SAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Dec 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 06 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2010