Sahans, Satvir Singh (CPSO#: 110837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 12 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATVIR SINGH SAHANS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SAHANS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SAHANS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAHANS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SAHANS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SAHANS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SAHANS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018