Sahheed, Sarah Simone Siobhan (CPSO#: 107007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nixon Walk-In Clinic
510 Southdale Rd. E. Unit 101
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: 519-914-5202
Fax: 519-914-5204
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH SIMONE SIOBHAN SAHHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2017