Sahheed, Wade Waheed (CPSO#: 61012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308 B
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 615-8301
Fax: (905) 615-8920
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wade Sahheed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sahheed ( CPSO# 61012 )

Business Address:
308B - 3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 615-8301

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WADE WAHEED SAHHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHHEED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990