Sahjpaul, Ramesh Lal (CPSO#: 58596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vancouver Coastal Health
405 125 E 13th Street
North Vancouver BC  V7L 2L3
Phone: (604) 904-7467
Fax: (604) 904-7462

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMESH LAL SAHJPAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHJPAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1988